+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
January 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor