+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
March 11, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor