+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ returned to Rules Committee
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 27, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 28, 2007: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 13, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor