+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor