+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor