+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 4, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor