+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2011: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 9, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 4, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 6
February 2, 2011: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
January 28, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor