+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2021: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor