+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ filed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor