+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2012: Senate/ failed
March 5, 2012: Senate/ motion to reconsider
March 5, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 29, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor