+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 19, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (3)
February 29, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 24, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor