+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2021: Senate/ circled
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor