+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 11, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 55
- Absent: 20
March 10, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2015: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 4, 2015: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 4, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 4, 2015: Senate/ substituted
February 25, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor