+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
March 10, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor