+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/suspension
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 6
March 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 7, 2016: Senate/ passed 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/suspension
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 5
March 7, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 5
March 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor