+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ under suspension of the rules
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ returned to Rules Committee
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (3)
House Amendment # 3
Passed
Senate Amendment # 2
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2008: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
February 29, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor