+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor