+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor