+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 29, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Vote
February 22, 2005: Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor