+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
March 2, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2021: Senate/ circled
March 1, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor