+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 3
March 9, 2017: House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
March 6, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
March 1, 2017: Senate/ circled
February 28, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2017: Senate/ substituted
February 28, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 17, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor