+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (8)
March 13, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: House/ substituted
March 13, 2014: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 7, 2014: Senate/ substituted
March 7, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor