+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ filed
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 4, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
March 1, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor