+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ lift bill from committee
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3 (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ circled
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
March 9, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 14
February 25, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor