+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/enacting clause struck
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/returned to Senate Secretary
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from LRGC
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor