+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 25, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor