+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 24, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 24, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
February 24, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 22, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2012: Senate/ substituted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor