+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ substitute adoption failed from # 1 to # 2
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 2020: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 11, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4
March 11, 2020: House/ substitute adoption failed from # 1 to # 2
March 11, 2020: House/ floor amendment # 2
March 6, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2020: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3