+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 11, 2014: House/ circled
March 6, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 4, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 21, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor