+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 25, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor