+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor