+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
March 3, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
March 1, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
February 28, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2017: Senate/ circled
February 16, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor