+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 75
March 7, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
March 4, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 1, 2019: Senate/ uncircled
March 1, 2019: Senate/ circled
March 1, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2019: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor