+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor