+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2018: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 5, 2018: Senate/ uncircled
March 5, 2018: Senate/ circled
February 27, 2018: Senate/ motion to reconsider
February 27, 2018: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor