+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
- Governor Signed
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
November 10, 2021: House/ circled
November 10, 2021: House/ motion to reconsider
November 10, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 4
November 10, 2021: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
November 10, 2021: House/ uncircled
November 10, 2021: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
November 9, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor