+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2018: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 2
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2018: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor