+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 4, 2021: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
January 27, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
January 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor