+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor