+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ failed
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 2020: House/ failed
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 5
March 9, 2020: Senate/ uncircled
March 9, 2020: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
March 9, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2020: Senate/ circled
March 6, 2020: Senate/ motion to reconsider
March 5, 2020: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor