+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (11)
March 8, 2017: House/ circled
March 8, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2017: House/ uncircled
March 3, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
March 3, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2017: Senate/ substituted
March 3, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3
February 28, 2017: Senate/ circled
February 28, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 27, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor