+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor