+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Governor
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/signed by President/ enrolled
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Signed by Speaker sent Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 3rd
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/to House
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/committee report favorable
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from LRGC
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor