+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 7, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/suspension
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
March 2, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 2, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
March 1, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor