+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Governor
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- Enroll Draft
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
- Bill Distributed
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from LRGC
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/from Rules Comm to 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Read 3rd Time
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Signed by Speaker sent Senate
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/signed by President/ enrolled
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor