+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2016: House/ circled
March 8, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
March 8, 2016: House/ uncircled
March 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3