+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2015: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor