+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ to Senate
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 7, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor