+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ to Senate
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 5, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 30, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 6, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 5
February 2, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 29
January 27, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor