+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ circled
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 21, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 10, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor